EP1062729 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE WITH ILLUMINATED OPERATOR BUTTONS, THE ACTIVATION OF SAID OPERATOR BUTTONS BEING DETERMINED BY DETECTION OF THE CHANGE IN THE LUMINOUS REFLECTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYCHLAK, Stefan Zum Busch 12 D-31241 Ilsede / DE | [2000/52] | Application number, filing date | 98959742.2 | 20.10.1998 | [2000/52] | WO1998DE03070 | Priority number, date | DE1998109886 | 07.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19809886 | [2000/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9945649 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1062729 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1062729 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/968 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
H03K17/968 (EP,US);
H03K17/969 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/52] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT MIT BELEUCHTETEN BEDIENTASTEN, WOBEI DIE BETÄTIGUNG DER BEDIENTASTEN DURCH DIE ERFASSUNG DER ÄNDERUNG DER LICHTREFLEKTION FESTGESTELLT WIRD | [2000/52] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE WITH ILLUMINATED OPERATOR BUTTONS, THE ACTIVATION OF SAID OPERATOR BUTTONS BEING DETERMINED BY DETECTION OF THE CHANGE IN THE LUMINOUS REFLECTANCE | [2000/52] | French: | APPAREIL ELECTRONIQUE A TOUCHES DE COMMANDE ECLAIREES, L'ACTIONNEMENT DE CES DERNIERES ETANT DETERMINE PAR LA DETECTION DE LA VARIATION DE LA REFLEXION DE LA LUMIERE | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 03.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3611988 (NCR CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 1 - page 10, line 17; figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [A]DE19615051 (HAUPT ROLF WILHELM [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 17; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0448826 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 34; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE19632334 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 55; figures 5,6,8; claims 1,3,4 * |