Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.07.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] |
14.03.2003 | Change - applicant | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] |
01.03.2003 | Renewal fee | |
25.09.2002 | Change - extension states | |
31.05.2002 | Definitive list of designations | published on 17.07.2002 [2002/29] |
13.03.2002 | Renewal fee | |
16.11.2001 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] |
07.09.2001 | Publication of search report | published on 24.10.2001 [2001/43] |
07.09.2001 | Change - classification | published on 24.10.2001 [2001/43] |
23.02.2001 | Renewal fee | |
16.07.1999 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.09.1999 [1999/35] |