Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3169883B | Global Dossier | 28.05.2001 | B2 | JPH11251561 | 17.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4565298 | 26.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0939445 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2001 | A3 | EP0939445 | 01.09.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP4565298 | 26.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1227414 | 01.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4565298 | 26.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100309304B | 26.09.2001 | B1 | KR19990072900 | 27.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4565298 | 26.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW452964B | 01.09.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | JP4565298 | 26.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6075260 | 13.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4565298 | 26.02.1998 |