EP0939445 - Semiconductor integrated circuit device and method of arranging functional cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | ||
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harayama, Masahiro c/o NEC IC Micro PC Syst., Ltd. 403-53, Kosugimachi 1-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99103677.3 | 25.02.1999 | [1999/35] | Priority number, date | JP19980045652 | 26.02.1998 Original published format: JP 4565298 | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0939445 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0939445 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/118, H01L27/02 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
H01L27/118 (EP,US);
H01L27/10 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1999/35] | H01L27/118 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/29] |
Former [1999/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Halbleiter integriertes Schaltkreisbauelement und Anordnungsverfahren für Funktionszellen | [1999/35] | English: | Semiconductor integrated circuit device and method of arranging functional cell | [1999/35] | French: | Dispositif de circuit intégré à semi-conducteur et le procédé d'arrangement de cellule fonctionnelle | [1999/35] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 10.07.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2018021 (RACAL MICROELECT SYSTEM) [X] 1-3,6,8,11 * page 1, line 16 - line 43 * * page 1, line 82; figure 1 *; | [X]WO8500468 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8,11 * abstract * * page 6, line 6 - line 25; figure 1 ** page 6, line 26 - line 34; figure 2 *; | [XA]US5444275 (KUGISHIMA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,11 * column 5, line 43 - line 55; figures 3A,10 * * column 8, line 14 - line 29; figures 21,22 * [A] 4,5,9,10; | [XA]US5517041 (TORII KENSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,11 * abstract * * column 2, line 12 - line 20 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 26 * * column 6, line 59 - column 7, line 2; figure 2 * [A] 4,5,9,10 |