EP0948944 - Line operated light curing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ivoclar Vivadent AG Bendererstrasse 2 9494 Schaan / LI | [2001/15] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states IVOCLAR AG Bendererstrasse 2 9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eggler, Andreas, Dr. Rutzenbergstrasse 41 6922 Wolfurt / AT | 02 /
Rohner, Gottfried Forstgasse 6 9450 Altstätten / CH | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Baronetzky, Klaus, et al Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann, Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99104974.3 | 12.03.1999 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | DE1998115846 | 08.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19815846 | [1999/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0948944 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0948944 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61C19/00 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
A61C19/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2000/26] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Netzbetriebenes Lichthärtgerät | [1999/41] | English: | Line operated light curing apparatus | [1999/41] | French: | Appareil de photopolymérisation alimenté par le réseau | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 22.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.03.2005 | GB | 12.03.2005 | SE | 13.03.2005 | CH | 31.03.2005 | LI | 31.03.2005 | [2006/14] |
Former [2006/13] | AT | 03.03.2005 | |
GB | 12.03.2005 | ||
SE | 13.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | AT | 03.03.2005 | |
SE | 13.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 03.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4839566 (HEROLD WOLF-DIETRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 4, lines 18-23 ** figure 2 *; | [A]DE3840984 (PETZ GUENTER [DE]) [A] 1-13 * column 1, lines 3-9 * * column 2, lines 41-47 * * column 3, lines 24-28 * * figures 1,6 *; | [A]US5184044 (THOMAS BRIAN J [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 4, lines 34-61 * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE2841112 |