EP0947965 - Storage station for transport trolleys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brüder Siegel GmbH + Co. KG Draht- und Metallwarenfabrik Hinter der Post 4-8 89340 Leipheim / DE | [2005/52] |
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states Brüder Siegel GmbH + Co. KG Draht- und Metallwarenfabrik Hinter der Post 4-8 89340 Leipheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiedenmann, Gerhard Bleichenweg 11 89347 Bubesheim / DE | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | Grättinger & Partner (GbR) Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99104997.4 | 12.03.1999 | [1999/40] | Priority number, date | DE19981014918 | 03.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19814918 | [1999/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0947965 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0947965 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | [2000/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0947965 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/06, A47F10/04 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
G07F7/0636 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/24] |
Former [1999/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Aufbewahrungsstation für Transportwagen | [1999/40] | English: | Storage station for transport trolleys | [1999/40] | French: | Station de stockage pour chariots de transport | [1999/40] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 28.03.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | 27.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 19.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Request for further processing for: | 19.10.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 19.10.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.11.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.05.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.05.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.05.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.05.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.05.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.05.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.05.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.05.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.05.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.05.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.05.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4474282 (LENANDER AAGE [DK]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2575569 (MALOEUVRE ROBERT [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 5, line 14 - line 15 * * page 6, line 29 - line 32 * * figure 4 *; | [A]US4635782 (WIETH FRANZ [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 5, line 12 - line 16; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0231934 (WANZL KG RUDOLF [DE]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2611066 (RONIS SA [FR], et al) [A] 1,4* the whole document * | by applicant | DE3921872 | DE3925442 | DE3943067 | EP0301940 | DE4115547 | DE4131263 | DE9306075U | EP0643372 |