EP0950905 - Process for producing a novel resin for optical materials having excellent color tone and transparency [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2006 [2006/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. No. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/42] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. No. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amagai, Akikazu, Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Comp., Inc Tokyo Research Laboratory, 1-1, Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takeuchi, Motoharu, Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Comp. Inc. Tokyo Research Laborat., 1-1, Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Mizuno, Katsuyuki, Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Comp. Inc. Tokyo Research Laborat., 1-1, Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/42] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/42] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal Patentanwälte - European Patent Attorneys, Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99105372.9 | 16.03.1999 | [1999/42] | Priority number, date | JP19980079734 | 26.03.1998 Original published format: JP 7973498 | [1999/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0950905 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0950905 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | [2002/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/04, C08G75/08 | [1999/42] | CPC: |
C08G75/08 (EP,US);
G02B1/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
G02B1/04, C08L81/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/44] |
Former [1999/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren für die Herstellung von einem neuen Harz verwendbar als optisches Material mit hervorragendem Farbton und Transparenz | [1999/42] | English: | Process for producing a novel resin for optical materials having excellent color tone and transparency | [1999/42] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'une nouvelle résine utilisable comme matériau optique représentant une tonalité de couleurs et une transparence excellente | [1999/42] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 11.06.2003 | Observations by third parties | 11.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/17] | 25.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0785194 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 10, line 45 - page 11, line 52; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0761665 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 11, line 4 - line 12; claim - *; | [PX]EP0874016 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [PX] 1-5 * example -; claim - * | other | JPH09110979 | JPH0310979K |