EP0945622 - Synchronous electric pump with silencing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PMP S.P.A. Via Fernanda Wittgens 5 20123 Milano / IT | [1999/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sante, Blasi Frazione Attiggio 60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Forattini, Amelia, et al Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | Forattini, Amelia, et al c/o Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99105937.9 | 24.03.1999 | [1999/39] | Priority number, date | IT1998MC00014U | 27.03.1998 Original published format: IT MC980014 U | [1999/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0945622 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0945622 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F04D13/02, H02K7/118 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
H02K7/118 (EP);
F04D13/021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2000/24] |
Former [1999/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Synchronmotorpumpe mit Schalldämpfereinrichtung | [1999/39] | English: | Synchronous electric pump with silencing device | [1999/39] | French: | Pompe à moteur éléctrique synchrone avec silencieux | [1999/39] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 30.03.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 26.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.04.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 21.07.2004 | ES | 01.11.2004 | [2006/32] |
Former [2005/23] | ES | 01.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0723329 (ASKOLL SRL [IT]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 6, line 29 - line 34 * * column 8, line 44 - column 10, line 2; figures 3,17 * [A] 2,3; | [X]EP0514272 (ELECTRO MEC NIVERNAIS [FR]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 20; figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE4232939 (MASSINDUSTRIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4424257 (AWECO KUNSTSTOFFTECH GERAETE [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 24 - line 27 * * column 3, line 46 - line 55; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9421026 (HANNING ELEKTRO WERKE [DE], et al) |