Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0927945

EP0927945 - Method and system for placing a purchase order via a communications network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  27.09.2013
Database last updated on 22.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2013Revocation of patentpublished on 30.10.2013  [2013/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amazon.Com, Inc.
1516 Second Avenue
Seattle, WA 98101 / US
[1999/27]
Inventor(s)01 / The inventor has agreed to waive his entitlement to designation.
02 / Kaphan, Shel
7748, 32nd Avenue North East
Seattle, WA 98115 / US
 [2011/13]
Former [1999/27]01 / Bezos, Jeffrey, P.
81 Vine Street, 203
Seattle, WA 98101 / US
02 / Kaphan, Shel
7748, 32nd Avenue North East
Seattle, WA 98115 / US
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/27]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99105948.611.09.1998
[1999/27]
Priority number, dateUS1997092895112.09.1997         Original published format: US 928951
US1998004650323.03.1998         Original published format: US 46503
[1999/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0927945
Date:07.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0927945
Date:14.07.1999
[1999/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0927945
Date:23.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[1999/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/27]
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zum Bestellen über elektronisches Nachrichtennetzwerk[1999/27]
English:Method and system for placing a purchase order via a communications network[1999/27]
French:Méthode et système pour effectuer une commande par un réseau de communication[1999/27]
Examination procedure24.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/27]
15.04.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
23.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.05.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
04.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
29.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2003Fee for grant paid
20.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP98117261.2  / EP0902381
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.08.2003  06.02.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Gesellschaft für Informatik e.V.
Ahrstr. 45
53175 Bonn / DE
 02  29.09.2003  15.10.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Fleurop-Interflora European Business Company AG
Stelzenstrasse 6
8152 Glattbrugg / CH
Opponent's representative
Müller, Christoph Emanuel, et al
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
 03  23.01.2004  27.04.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Förderverein für eine Freie Informationelle Infrastruktur e.V. (FFII e.V. )
Malmöer Strasse 6
10439 Berlin / DE
 [2013/30]
Former [2008/50]
Opponent(s)01  27.08.2003  06.02.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Gesellschaft für Informatik e.V.
Ahrstr. 45
53175 Bonn / DE
 02  29.09.2003  15.10.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Fleurop-Interflora European Business Company AG
Stelzenstrasse 6
8152 Glattbrugg / CH
Opponent's representative
Müller, Christoph Emanuel, et al
Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
 03  23.01.2004  27.04.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Förderverein für eine Freie Informationelle Infrastruktur e.V.
Gutenbergstr. 17
80636 München / DE
Former [2007/51]
Opponent(s)01  27.08.2003  06.02.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Gesellschaft für Informatik e.V.
Ahrstr. 45
53175 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Springorum, Harald
Kiani & Springorum Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Taubenstrasse 4
40479 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  29.09.2003  15.10.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Fleurop-Interflora European Business Company AG
Stelzenstrasse 6
8152 Glattbrugg / CH
Opponent's representative
Müller, Christoph Emanuel, et al
Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
 03  23.01.2004  27.04.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Förderverein für eine Freie Informationelle Infrastruktur e.V.
Gutenbergstr. 17
80636 München / DE
Former [2004/51]
Opponent(s)01  27.08.2003  06.02.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Gesellschaft für Informatik e.V.
Ahrstr. 45
53175 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Springorum, Harald
Kiani & Springorum Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Taubenstrasse 4
40479 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  29.09.2003  15.10.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Fleurop-Interflora European Business Company AG
Stelzenstrasse 6
8152 Glattbrugg / CH
Opponent's representative
Müller, Christoph Emanuel, et al
Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
 03  23.01.2004  27.04.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Förderverein für eine Freie Informationelle Infrastruktur e.V.
Gutenbergstr. 17
80636 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Koglin, Olaf
Lenhardt Rechtsanwälte Kurfürstendamm 46
10707 Berlin / DE
Former [2004/25]
Opponent(s)01  27.08.2003  06.02.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Gesellschaft für Informatik e.V.
Ahrstr. 45
53175 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Springorum, Harald, Dr.
Kiani & Springorum, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Heinrich-Heine-Allee 29
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  29.09.2003  15.10.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Fleurop-Interflora European Business Company AG
Stelzenstrasse 6
8152 Glattbrugg / CH
Opponent's representative
Müller, Christoph Emanuel, et al
Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
 03  23.01.2004  27.04.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Förderverein für eine Freie Informationelle Infrastruktur e.V.
Gutenbergstr. 17
80636 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Koglin, Olaf
Lenhardt Rechtsanwälte Kurfürstendamm 46
10707 Berlin / DE
Former [2004/14]
Opponent(s)01  27.08.2003  06.02.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Gesellschaft für Informatik e.V.
Ahrstr. 45
53175 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Springorum, Harald, Dr.
Kiani & Springorum, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Heinrich-Heine-Allee 29
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  29.09.2003  15.10.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Fleurop-Interflora European Business Company AG
Stelzenstrasse 6
8152 Glattbrugg / CH
Opponent's representative
Müller, Christoph Emanuel, et al
Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
 03  23.01.2004  27.04.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Förderverein für eine Freie Informationelle Infrastruktur e.V.
Gutenbergstr. 17
80636 München / DE
Former [2003/49]
Opponent(s)01  27.08.2003   
Gesellschaft für Informatik e.V.
Ahrstr. 45
53175 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Springorum, Harald, Dr.
Kiani & Springorum, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Heinrich-Heine-Allee 29
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  29.09.2003  15.10.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Fleurop-Interflora European Business Company AG
Stelzenstrasse 6
8152 Glattbrugg / CH
Opponent's representative
Müller, Christoph Emanuel, et al
Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
Former [2003/43]
Opponent(s)01  27.08.2003   
Gesellschaft für Informatik e.V.
Ahrstr. 45
53175 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Springorum, Harald, Dr.
Kiani & Springorum, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Heinrich-Heine-Allee 29
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
03.05.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.08.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.12.2007Date of oral proceedings
09.06.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.06.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.06.2012
12.06.2012Date of oral proceedings
04.07.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.09.2012
05.09.2012Date of oral proceedings
15.01.2013Date of oral proceedings
15.01.2013Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/44]
05.06.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.06.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition19.08.2008Appeal received No.  T1616/08
16.10.2008Statement of grounds filed
11.11.2009Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
11.11.2009Date of oral proceedings
16.11.2009Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.04.2003
BE23.04.2003
CH23.04.2003
FI23.04.2003
LI23.04.2003
NL23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
CY11.09.2003
IE11.09.2003
LU11.09.2003
MC30.09.2003
ES30.10.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/40]AT23.04.2003
BE23.04.2003
CH23.04.2003
FI23.04.2003
LI23.04.2003
NL23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
CY11.09.2003
IE11.09.2003
LU11.09.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/39]AT23.04.2003
BE23.04.2003
CH23.04.2003
FI23.04.2003
LI23.04.2003
NL23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
CY11.09.2003
LU11.09.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/36]AT23.04.2003
BE23.04.2003
CH23.04.2003
FI23.04.2003
LI23.04.2003
NL23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
CY11.09.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/28]AT23.04.2003
BE23.04.2003
CH23.04.2003
FI23.04.2003
LI23.04.2003
NL23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/23]AT23.04.2003
CH23.04.2003
FI23.04.2003
LI23.04.2003
NL23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/05]AT23.04.2003
CH23.04.2003
FI23.04.2003
LI23.04.2003
NL23.04.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/03]AT23.04.2003
CH23.04.2003
LI23.04.2003
NL23.04.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
Former [2004/02]CH23.04.2003
LI23.04.2003
NL23.04.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
Former [2003/41]SE23.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0902381  (AMAZON COM INC [US]) [E] 1-11 * claims 56-66 *;
 [PX]EP0845747  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-11 * column 4, line 26 - column 4, line 47 * * column 5, line 19 - column 11, line 21; figures 1-9 *;
 [A]WO9530961  (TACKBARY MARY THOMASMA [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 9, line 6 - page 12, line 22 * * page 23, line 15 - page 25, line 19 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5451998  (HAMRICK DANIEL C [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]  PACK T, "All about books-online", DATABASE, FEB.-MARCH 1997, ONLINE INC, USA, ISSN 0162-4105, vol. 20, no. 1, pages 12 - 13, 16 - 21, XP002102729 [A] 1-11