EP0971527 - E-mail converting apparatus, internet facsimile apparatus, and e-mail transmission method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Communications Co., Ltd. 4-1-62, Minoshima, Hakata-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 812-8531 / JP | [2009/43] |
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states Panasonic Communications Co., Ltd. 4-1-62, Minoshima, Hakata-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8531 / JP | ||
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA GRAPHIC COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS, INC. 3-8, Shimomeguro 2-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8687 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onuma, Asahiro 5-20-6-1316, Kitasuna, Koto-ku Tokyo 136-0073 / JP | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106642.4 | 31.03.1999 | [2000/02] | Priority number, date | JP19980195667 | 10.07.1998 Original published format: JP 19566798 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0971527 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0971527 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0971527 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
H04N1/00212 (EP,US);
H04N1/00222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/43] |
Former [2000/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Umwandlungsgerät für E-Mail, Fax-Gerät für Internet, und Verfahren zur Sendung von E-Mails | [2000/02] | English: | E-mail converting apparatus, internet facsimile apparatus, and e-mail transmission method | [2000/02] | French: | Appareil convertiseur d'e-mails, appareil de facsimilés par internet, et méthode de transmissions d'e-mails | [2000/02] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 23.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0880268 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-3,5-7,9-16,18-20,22-28 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 52 *; | [A]US5675507 (BOBO II CHARLES R [US]) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * figures 4,6 *; | [A]WO9710668 (KULAKOWSKI ROBERT T [US]) [A] 1-26 * abstract *; | [A]EP0835021 (MATSUSHITA GRAPHIC COMMUNIC [JP]) [A] 1-28 * abstract * |