EP0965449 - Wedge ink duct [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [1999/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thieme, Torsten Hoflössnitzstrasse 80 01445 Radebeul / DE | [1999/51] | Application number, filing date | 99111469.5 | 12.06.1999 | [1999/51] | Priority number, date | DE1998126817 | 16.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19826817 | [1999/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0965449 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0965449 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | [2000/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0965449 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41F31/04, B41F31/08 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
B41F31/04 (EP);
B41F31/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/50] |
Former [1999/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Keilfarbkasten | [1999/51] | English: | Wedge ink duct | [1999/51] | French: | Bac d'encrage à coins | [1999/51] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 27.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE4339939 (WAGNER ROBERT [DE]) [YD] 1-5 * siehe Zusammenfassung; column 2, line 6 - column 5, line 6; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]DE19640775 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * siehe Zusammenfassung; column 1, line 42 - column 4, line 6; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]DE2816881 (HARRIS CORP) [Y] 3 * page 20, line 4 - page 27, line L; figures 1-8 *; | [A]DE1944832U (KOPPERS CO INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line L; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0022912 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]CH649954 (WIFAG MASCHF) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |