EP0986216 - Transmission system, bandwidth management apparatus, and bandwidth management method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/11] | Tranmission system, bandwidth management apparatus, and bandwidth management method | ||
[2007/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ibaraki, Susumu Kouryounishimachi 1-6-28-508 Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu 590-0026 / JP | 02 /
Hattori, Toshikazu Kyotofu Kyoto-shi Yamashinaku Otowa Santouchi 40-3 Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 607-8065 / JP | 03 /
Kurosaki, Toshihiko Nadaku, Takahacho 1-3-3 Kobe-shi, Hyogoken 657-0023 / JP | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99115349.5 | 03.08.1999 | [2000/11] | Priority number, date | JP19980220044 | 04.08.1998 Original published format: JP 22004498 | JP19990200826 | 14.07.1999 Original published format: JP 20082699 | [2000/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0986216 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0986216 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0986216 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/40, H04L12/56 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
H04L12/40058 (EP,US);
H04L12/40065 (EP,US);
H04L47/70 (EP,US);
H04L47/745 (EP,US);
H04L47/765 (EP,US);
H04L47/781 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/21] |
Former [2000/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Übertragungssystem, Verfahren und Vorrichtung für Bandbreiteverwaltung | [2000/11] | English: | Transmission system, bandwidth management apparatus, and bandwidth management method | [2007/42] | French: | Système de transmission, procédé et dispositif pour la gestion de largeur de bande | [2000/11] |
Former [2000/11] | Tranmission system, bandwidth management apparatus, and bandwidth management method | Examination procedure | 28.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 03.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 04.02.2008 | [2008/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5001707 (KOSITPAIBOON RUNGNOJ [CA], et al) [Y] 4,14,18 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 39 *; | [A]US5477542 (TAKAHARA KEIKO [JP], et al) [A] 11,16,20* column 2, line 28 - line 50 *; | [A]US5502714 (SALLBERG KRISTER [SE]) [A] 4,14,18 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9631036 (TELIA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 4,14,18 * page 5, line 10 - line 21 *; | [A]EP0825784 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3,13,14,17 * column 7, line 17 - line 29 *; | [A]US5748629 (CALDARA STEPHEN A [US], et al) [A] 5,15,19 * abstract *; | [A]WO9831121 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-3,13,14,17 * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 3 *; | [A] - ABRAHAM S P ET AL, "MAX-MIN FAIR RATE CONTROL OF ABR CONNECTIONS WITH NONZERO MCRS", IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. PHOENIX, ARIZONA, NOV. 3 - 8, 1997, GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (GLOBECOM), NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19971103), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-4199-6, pages 498 - 502, XP000737583 [A] 1,13,17 * abstract * | [A] - MARTINI P ET AL, "CONNECTION ORIENTED DATA SERVICE IN DQDB SIMULATION STUDIES OF THE GUARANTEED BANDWIDTH PROTOCOL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL PHOENIX CONFERENCE ON COMPUTERS AND COMMUNICATIONS. TEMPE, MAR. 23 - 26, 1993, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19930323), vol. CONF. 12, ISBN 0-7803-0922-7, pages 339 - 345, XP000370498 [A] 1,13,17 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PCCC.1993.344444 |