Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0986011
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
14.09.2007 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] |
31.03.2007 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.09.2006 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.09.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.07.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.05.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.01.2003 |
First examination report |
|
03.01.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.09.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.12.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
11.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.08.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 04.10.2001 [2001/40] |
28.07.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] |
01.12.2000 |
Publication of search report |
published on 17.01.2001 [2001/03] |
28.01.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] |