Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] |
15.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
04.10.2001 | Change - extension states | |
05.06.2001 | Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) | |
05.06.2001 | Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) | |
01.06.2001 | Definitive list of designations | published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] |
29.03.2001 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
15.09.2000 | Publication of search report | published on 02.11.2000 [2000/44] |
09.07.1999 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.08.1999 [1999/34] |