EP0973070 - Magnetic particles and magnetic carrier for electrophotographic developer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TODA KOGYO CORPORATION 1-2, Funairi-minami 4-chome, Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | [2007/12] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states Toda Kogyo Corporation 1-2, Funairi-minami 4-chome, Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | ||
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states TODA KOGYO CORP. 7-1 Yokogawa-Shinmachi Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hakata, Toshiyuki 11-30, Fujinoki 3-chome, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. Gray's Inn 14 South Square London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99305576.3 | 14.07.1999 | [2000/03] | Priority number, date | JP19980203192 | 17.07.1998 Original published format: JP 20319298 | [2000/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0973070 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0973070 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/113, H01F1/36 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
H01F1/36 (EP,US);
G03G9/1136 (EP,US);
G03G9/1138 (EP,US);
G03G9/1139 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2995 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/40] |
Former [2000/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Magnetische Teilchen und magnetischer Träger für elektrophotographische Entwickler | [2000/03] | English: | Magnetic particles and magnetic carrier for electrophotographic developer | [2000/03] | French: | Particules magnétiques et agent de véhiculation magnétique pour révélateurs électrophotographiques | [2000/03] | Examination procedure | 24.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 16.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 21.03.2007 | NL | 21.03.2007 | GB | 14.07.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/24] | NL | 21.03.2007 | |
GB | 14.07.2007 | ||
FR | 23.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | NL | 21.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH06222619 ; | [Y]JPH07104522 ; | [Y]JPH1078681 ; | [Y]EP0662644 (KAO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1 * claims 1-8 *; | [Y]EP0679956 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1 * page 4, line 37 - line 39; claims 6-8,12,13 *; | [Y]US4841331 (NAKAYAMA NOBUHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 65 - line 67; examples 1-16 * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 37, Database accession no. 1994-297032, XP002121433 & JPH06222619 A 19940812 (RICOH) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 25, Database accession no. 1995-188216, XP002121434 & JPH07104522 A 19950421 (POWDER TEC) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 22, Database accession no. 1998-246766, XP002121435 & JPH1078681 A 19980324 (RICOH) [Y] 1 * abstract * |