EP1055269 - LOCKING DEVICE FOR COMPUTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Top-Cousins Oy Kutomotie 13 00380 Helsinki / FI | [2000/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERVO, Janne Pl 125 FIN-80101 Joensuu / FI | 02 /
VÄISÄNEN, Kim Pl 125 FIN-80101 Joensuu / FI | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | LEITZINGER OY Tammasaarenkatu 1 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | LEITZINGER OY Ruoholahdenkatu 8 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 99900486.4 | 14.01.1999 | [2000/48] | WO1999FI00020 | Priority number, date | FI19980000066 | 15.01.1998 Original published format: FI 980066 | [2000/48] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9936996 | Date: | 22.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1055269 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/40, H01R13/639, E05B73/00 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
H01R13/639 (EP,US);
E05B73/0082 (EP,US);
G06F1/181 (EP,US);
H01R13/60 (EP,US);
G06F2200/1639 (EP,US);
Y10T70/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2000/48] | Title | German: | VERRIEGLUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN KOMPUTER | [2000/48] | English: | LOCKING DEVICE FOR COMPUTER | [2000/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BLOCAGE POUR ORDINATEUR | [2000/48] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.1999 | Translation filed | 16.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 16.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 14.11.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8602759 (HELLMAN NAT III); | [X]US4898009 (LAKOSKI ROBERT P [US], et al); | [A]US5398530 (DERMAN JAY S [US]); | [A]US5709110 (GREENFIELD JACK [US], et al) |