EP0996799 - PIVOTAL CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DORMA GmbH + Co. KG Breckerfelder Strasse 42-48 58256 Ennepetal / DE | [2000/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINKE, Andreas Taubenstrasse 32 D-58285 Gevelsberg / DE | [2000/18] | Application number, filing date | 99904868.9 | 08.02.1999 | [2000/18] | WO1999EP00808 | Priority number, date | DE1998104859 | 09.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19804859 | [2000/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9940280 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0996799 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0996799 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E05D1/06 | [2000/18] | CPC: |
E05D15/0652 (EP,US);
E05D1/06 (EP,US);
E05D7/1066 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/11 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/528 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/53 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/132 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/18] | Title | German: | SCHWENKBARE VERBINDUNG | [2000/18] | English: | PIVOTAL CONNECTION | [2000/18] | French: | LIAISON PIVOTANTE | [2000/18] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 11.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3060492 (WERNER DELLITH) [A] 1 * column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * column 2, line 26 - line 34; figure - *; | [A]DE4303784 (FLUOROWARE INC [US]) [A] 1* column 2, line 58 - column 6, line 30; figure - * | by applicant | DE9419652U | - firmenkatalog der firma schueco international, page 55 |