Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002506703 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | AUPP661398 | 20.10.1998 | AUPP244798 | 18.03.1998 | AU9900184 | 18.03.1999 | AUPP713898 | 17.11.1998 | AUPP246798 | 19.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU733482B | Global Dossier | 17.05.2001 | B2 | AU2915399 | 11.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | AUPP661398 | 20.10.1998 | AUPP244798 | 18.03.1998 | AU2915399 | 18.03.1999 | AU9900184 | 18.03.1999 | AUPP713898 | 17.11.1998 | AUPP246798 | 19.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1062012 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2005 | B1 | EP1062012 | 17.07.2002 | A4 | EP1062012 | 27.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPP661398 | 20.10.1998 | AUPP244798 | 18.03.1998 | AU9900184 | 18.03.1999 | AUPP713898 | 17.11.1998 | AUPP246798 | 19.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE300341T | 15.08.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | AUPP661398 | 20.10.1998 | AUPP244798 | 18.03.1998 | AU9900184 | 18.03.1999 | AUPP713898 | 17.11.1998 | AUPP246798 | 19.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2319328 | 23.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPP661398 | 20.10.1998 | AUPP244798 | 18.03.1998 | AU9900184 | 18.03.1999 | AUPP713898 | 17.11.1998 | AUPP246798 | 19.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69926349D1 | 01.09.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | AUPP661398 | 20.10.1998 | AUPP244798 | 18.03.1998 | AU9900184 | 18.03.1999 | AUPP713898 | 17.11.1998 | AUPP246798 | 19.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2349583 | 28.02.2001 | B | GB2349583 | 08.11.2000 | A | GB0020657D0 | 11.10.2000 | D0 | Priority number | Date | AUPP661398 | 20.10.1998 | AUPP244798 | 18.03.1998 | AU9900184 | 18.03.1999 | AUPP713898 | 17.11.1998 | AUPP246798 | 19.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ506363 | 21.12.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | AUPP661398 | 20.10.1998 | AUPP244798 | 18.03.1998 | AU9900184 | 18.03.1999 | AUPP713898 | 17.11.1998 | AUPP246798 | 19.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6497623 | 24.12.2002 | B2 | US2002061784 | 23.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPP661398 | 20.10.1998 | US94968501 | 10.09.2001 | AUPP244798 | 18.03.1998 | US33147399 | 18.08.1999 | AUPP713898 | 17.11.1998 | AUPP246798 | 19.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6319140 | 20.11.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | AUPP661398 | 20.10.1998 | AUPP244798 | 18.03.1998 | AU9900184 | 18.03.1999 | AUPP713898 | 17.11.1998 | AUPP246798 | 19.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9947221 | Global Dossier | 23.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPP661398 | 20.10.1998 | AUPP244798 | 18.03.1998 | AUPP713898 | 17.11.1998 | AUPP246798 | 19.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1293585 | 02.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | AUPP661398 | 20.10.1998 | AUPP244798 | 18.03.1998 | AUPP713898 | 17.11.1998 | AUPP246798 | 19.03.1998 |