EP1062012 - AMUSEMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mirfin, Brian Unit 1, 17 Woodroffe Avenue Main Beach, QLD 4217 / AU | For all designated states Pondorfer, Walter Dölsach 68 9991 Dölsach (Tirol) / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states Mirfin, Brian Unit 1, 17 Woodroffe Avenue Main Beach, QLD 4217 / AU | ||
For all designated states Pondorfer, Walter 9991 Dölsach Nr. 68 / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | McKechnie, Neil Henry Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | McKechnie, Neil Henry Kennedys Patent Agency Limited Floor 4, Queens House 29 St Vincent Place Glasgow G1 2DT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99910029.0 | 18.03.1999 | [2000/52] | WO1999AU00184 | Priority number, date | AU1998PP02447 | 18.03.1998 Original published format: AU PP244798 | AU1998PP02467 | 19.03.1998 Original published format: AU PP246798 | AU1998PP06613 | 20.10.1998 Original published format: AU PP661398 | AU1998PP07138 | 17.11.1998 Original published format: AU PP713898 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9947221 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1062012 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1062012 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 23.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A63G31/00, A63G31/08 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
A63G31/08 (EP,US);
A63G31/00 (EP,US);
A63G9/00 (EP,US);
A63B2005/085 (EP,US);
A63B2005/163 (EP,US);
A63B2208/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/52] | A63G31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/52] | Title | German: | VERGNÜGUNGSGERÄT | [2000/52] | English: | AMUSEMENT DEVICE | [2000/52] | French: | APPAREIL DE DIVERTISSEMENT | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 03.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 03.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 09.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.07.2005 | BE | 27.07.2005 | CH | 27.07.2005 | CY | 27.07.2005 | FI | 27.07.2005 | FR | 27.07.2005 | IT | 27.07.2005 | LI | 27.07.2005 | NL | 27.07.2005 | DK | 27.10.2005 | GR | 27.10.2005 | SE | 27.10.2005 | DE | 28.10.2005 | ES | 07.11.2005 | PT | 27.12.2005 | IE | 20.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/17] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
BE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
IT | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
DE | 28.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
IE | 20.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
BE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
DE | 28.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
IE | 20.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
BE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
DE | 28.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
BE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
DE | 28.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
BE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
BE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2221215 (EYERLY LEE U) [X] 27,34 * page 1, column R, line 22 - line 28; figure - * [A] 1,2,7,14,28,29,35,38; | [XA]CH213833 (SCHNEIDER & CIE [FR], et al) [X] 1,19 * page 3, line 3 - line 28 * * page 3, line 37 - line 48; figure - * [A] 2,5-7,14,20,23,27-29,34,35,38; | [PX]EP0848973 (HUSS MASCHFAB GMBH & CO [DE]) [PX] 1,19 * column 8, line 15 - line 22 ** column 11, line 3 - line 24; figure -; claim 9 * | International search | [A]US5624321 (SNYDER STEPHEN D [US]); | [A]US5632686 (CHECKETTS STANLEY J [US]); | [A]US5649866 (BALWANZ C GRANT [US]) | by applicant | AU656110 |