EP1073455 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR EXTENDING THE ACTION OF CLOSTRIDIAL NEUROTOXIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine CA 92612 / US | ||
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states Allergan, Inc. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | ||
Former [2001/06] | For all designated states Allergan Sales, Inc. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOLLY, J., Oliver 7 Buckland Road Cheam Surrey SM2 7LP / GB | 02 /
AOKI, Kei, Roger 2 Ginger Lily Court Coto de Caza, CA 92679 / US | 03 /
DE PAIVA, Anton 1 Forge Cottage Ealing Green London W5 5EG / GB | [2001/18] |
Former [2001/06] | 01 /
DOLLY, J., Oliver 7 Buckland Road Cheam Surrey SM2 7LP / GB | ||
02 /
AOKI, Kei, Roger 2 Ginger Lily Court Coto de Caza, CA 92679 / US | |||
03 /
DE PAIVA, Anton 62 Ravensmede Way London W4 1TF / GB | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99919857.5 | 15.04.1999 | [2001/06] | WO1999US08303 | Priority number, date | US19980083472P | 29.04.1998 Original published format: US 83472 P | [2001/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9955359 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1073455 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1073455 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/16, A61K38/18, A61K38/30, A61K38/17, A61K38/39, // (A61K38/16, 39:395, 38:17),(A61K31/70, A61P25:00) | [2003/14] | CPC: |
A61K38/30 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61K38/177 (EP,US);
A61K38/1774 (EP,US);
A61K38/185 (EP,US);
A61K38/2093 (EP,US);
A61K38/4893 (EP,US);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/1709, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/4893, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2001/06] | A61K38/16, A61K38/18, A61K38/30, A61K38/17, A61K38/39, // (A61K38/16, 39:395, 38:17), A61K31:70 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/06] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND METHODE ZUM VERLÄNGUNG DER WIRKUNG DES CLOSTRIDIUMSNEUROTOXINS | [2001/06] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR EXTENDING THE ACTION OF CLOSTRIDIAL NEUROTOXIN | [2001/06] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT D'ETENDRE L'ACTION D'UNE NEUROTOXINE CLOSTRIDIALE | [2001/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 13.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.10.2003 | BE | 08.10.2003 | CH | 08.10.2003 | CY | 08.10.2003 | FI | 08.10.2003 | LI | 08.10.2003 | NL | 08.10.2003 | DK | 08.01.2004 | GR | 08.01.2004 | SE | 08.01.2004 | PT | 08.03.2004 | IE | 15.04.2004 | LU | 15.04.2004 | MC | 30.04.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/22] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
BE | 08.10.2003 | ||
CH | 08.10.2003 | ||
CY | 08.10.2003 | ||
FI | 08.10.2003 | ||
LI | 08.10.2003 | ||
NL | 08.10.2003 | ||
DK | 08.01.2004 | ||
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
SE | 08.01.2004 | ||
IE | 15.04.2004 | ||
LU | 15.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
BE | 08.10.2003 | ||
CH | 08.10.2003 | ||
FI | 08.10.2003 | ||
LI | 08.10.2003 | ||
NL | 08.10.2003 | ||
DK | 08.01.2004 | ||
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
SE | 08.01.2004 | ||
IE | 15.04.2004 | ||
LU | 15.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
BE | 08.10.2003 | ||
CH | 08.10.2003 | ||
FI | 08.10.2003 | ||
LI | 08.10.2003 | ||
NL | 08.10.2003 | ||
DK | 08.01.2004 | ||
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
SE | 08.01.2004 | ||
LU | 15.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
BE | 08.10.2003 | ||
CH | 08.10.2003 | ||
FI | 08.10.2003 | ||
LI | 08.10.2003 | ||
NL | 08.10.2003 | ||
DK | 08.01.2004 | ||
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
SE | 08.01.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
BE | 08.10.2003 | ||
CH | 08.10.2003 | ||
FI | 08.10.2003 | ||
LI | 08.10.2003 | ||
NL | 08.10.2003 | ||
DK | 08.01.2004 | ||
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
SE | 08.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
CH | 08.10.2003 | ||
FI | 08.10.2003 | ||
LI | 08.10.2003 | ||
NL | 08.10.2003 | ||
DK | 08.01.2004 | ||
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
SE | 08.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
CH | 08.10.2003 | ||
FI | 08.10.2003 | ||
LI | 08.10.2003 | ||
NL | 08.10.2003 | ||
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
SE | 08.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 08.10.2003 | |
FI | 08.10.2003 | ||
SE | 08.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 08.10.2003 | |
SE | 08.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 08.01.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5721215 (AOKI KEI ROGER [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 2, line 20 - line 55 * * column 5; table 1 * * column 7; table 1 *; | [XD] - CARONI P. ET AL, "Signaling by insulin-like growth factors in paralyzed skeletal muscle: Rapid induction of IGF1 expression in muscle fibers and prevention of interstitial cell proliferation by IGF-BP5 and IGF-BP4", THE JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (1994), vol. 14, no. 5, pages 3378 - 3388, XP002115584 [XD] 1-14 * abstract * * page 3379, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 3385, column 1 * * page 3386, column 2, paragraphs 2,3 * | [X] - CIFUENTES-DIAZ C., "The peripheral nerve and the neuromuscular junction are affected in the tenascin-C deficient mouse", CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (199803), vol. 44, no. 2, pages 357 - 379, XP002115585 [X] 12,21 * abstract * * pages 357-358 "introduction" * | [X] - BOOTH C.M. ET AL, "An antibody to neural cell adhesion molecule impairs motor nerve terminal sprouting in a mouse muscle locally paralysed with botulinum toxin", NEUROSCIENCE, (1990), vol. 35, no. 1, pages 85 - 91, XP002115586 [X] 1-8,12,23 * abstract * * page 85, columns 1-2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0306-4522(90)90123-L | [XD] - GURNEY M.E. ET AL, "Induction of motor neuron sprouting in vivo by ciliary neurotrophic factor and basic fibroblast growth factor", THE JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (1992), vol. 12, no. 8, pages 3241 - 3247, XP002115587 [XD] 12,16 * the whole document * | [XD] - A. K. MCALLISTER ET AL, "Neurotrophin regulation of cortical dendritic growth requires activity", NEURON, (1996), vol. 17, pages 1057 - 1064, XP002115588 [XD] 12,19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0896-6273(00)80239-1 | [XD] - CARONI P. ET AL, "Role of muscle insulin-like growth factors in nerve sprouting: suppression of terminal sprouting in paralyzed muscle by IGF-binding protein 4", THE JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 125, no. 4, pages 839 - 902, XP002115589 [XD] 1-8,10-14 * abstract * * page 897, paragraph 2 - page 898, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.125.4.893 | [TD] - PAIVA, A. ET AL, "Functional repair of motor endplates after botulinum neurotoxin type A poisoning: Biphasic switch of synaptic activity between nerve sprouts and their parent terminals", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, USA, (199903), vol. 96, pages 3200 - 3205, XP002115590 [TD] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.6.3200 |