EP1008280 - CONTACTING UNIT FOR A CARD-SHAPED CARRYING ELEMENT OF ELECTRONIC MODULES, ESPECIALLY ACCORDING TO PCMCIA STANDARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STOCKO Contact GmbH & Co. KG Simonshöfchen 31 42327 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states Stocko Contact GmbH & Co. KG Simonshöfchen 31 42327 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLATT, Dieter Am Schlagbaum 27 D-42489 Wülfrath / DE | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99925031.9 | 25.05.1999 | [2000/24] | WO1999EP03560 | Priority number, date | DE19982011425U | 29.06.1998 Original published format: DE 29811425 U | [2000/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0001210 | Date: | 06.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1008280 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1008280 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/12 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
H05K5/0269 (EP,US);
G06K19/077 (EP,US);
G06K19/07741 (EP,US);
G06K7/0021 (EP,US);
H01R12/725 (EP,US);
H01R13/6582 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/24] | Title | German: | KONTAKTIEREINHEIT FÜR EIN KARTENFÖRMIGES TRÄGERELEMENT ELEKTRONISCHER BAUGRUPPEN, INSBESONDERE NACH PCMCIA-NORM | [2000/24] | English: | CONTACTING UNIT FOR A CARD-SHAPED CARRYING ELEMENT OF ELECTRONIC MODULES, ESPECIALLY ACCORDING TO PCMCIA STANDARDS | [2000/24] | French: | UNITE DE MISE EN CONTACT POUR UN ELEMENT DE SUPPORT EN FORME DE CARTE DE MODULES ELECTRONIQUES, EN PARTICULIER CORRESPONDANT A LA NORME PCMCIA | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 03.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4432028 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1,2* figures 3-6 *; | [XY]DE29607253U (STOCKO METALLWARENFAB HENKELS [DE]) [X] 1,12-15 * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 21; figure 1; claim 3 * [Y] 4,6-11; | [XY]WO9642063 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,12-15 * abstract * [Y] 4-11; | [Y]DE29621835U (CONSTIN DESIGN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4,6-11 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9710566 (ELONEX PLC [GB]) [A] 1,2 * page 7, line 1 - line 14; figure 4C *; | [YA]EP0791890 (NEIFER WOLFGANG [DE]) [Y] 4-11 * figures 1,2 * [A] 1; | [A]DE29718773U (STOCKO METALLWARENFAB HENKELS [DE]) [A] 15 * page 5, line 21 - line 34; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [XY]FR2753597 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,15 * abstract * [Y] 4,6-11 |