|
08.01.2004 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2002 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2002 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2002 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.08.2001 |
Reply to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
04.05.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2001 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Translation of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.12.2000 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2000 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.08.2000 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
22.08.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
22.08.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.08.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.02.2000 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.02.2000 |
Description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.02.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
17.01.2000 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.01.2000 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
17.01.2000 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.11.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
05.11.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.10.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.10.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
07.10.1999 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.10.1999 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.09.1999 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.07.1999 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.07.1999 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
13.07.1999 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
13.07.1999 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |