09.01.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] |
17.01.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] |
13.12.2002 |
Change - designated states |
published on 29.01.2003 [2003/05] |
11.12.2002 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
26.08.2002 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
07.06.2002 |
Change - designated states |
published on 24.07.2002 [2002/30] |
04.06.2002 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
07.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.05.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
22.02.2002 |
Change - representative |
published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] |
05.02.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.01.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
29.08.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
29.08.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.07.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
22.06.2001 |
Change - German title |
published on 08.08.2001 [2001/32] |
12.05.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.04.2001 |
First examination report |
|
02.04.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.12.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.01.2001 [2001/05] |
15.12.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.01.2001 [2001/05] |
03.10.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|