Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1072077 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2003 | B1 | EP1072077 | 31.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19817231 | 17.04.1998 | DE9901128 | 14.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59904454D1 | 10.04.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19817231 | 17.04.1998 | DE9901128 | 14.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9954980 | Global Dossier | 28.10.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19817231 | 17.04.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1205717C | 08.06.2005 | C | CN1301422 | 27.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19817231 | 17.04.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19817231 | 02.12.1999 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE19817231 | 17.04.1998 |