Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU768549B | Global Dossier | 18.12.2003 | B2 | AU5067299 | 06.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP6399099 | 10.03.1999 | JP23660998 | 10.08.1998 | JP9904299 | 09.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1106701 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2005 | A4 | EP1106701 | 13.06.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP6399099 | 10.03.1999 | JP23660998 | 10.08.1998 | JP9904299 | 09.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2339048 | 24.02.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP6399099 | 10.03.1999 | JP23660998 | 10.08.1998 | JP9904299 | 09.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0009739 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP6399099 | 10.03.1999 | JP23660998 | 10.08.1998 |