EP1125636 - VISIBLE RADIATION TYPE PHOTOCATALYST AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ecodevice Laboratory Co., Ltd 7-4, Koyata 3-chome Iruma-shi Saitama 358-0026 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states Ecodevice Laboratory Co., Ltd 7-4, Koyata 3-chome Iruma-shi, Saitama 358-0026 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIHARA, Shinichi 12-37, Umegaoka, Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 227-0052 / JP | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2001/34] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99937067.9 | 13.08.1999 | [2001/34] | WO1999JP04396 | Priority number, date | JP19980235112 | 21.08.1998 Original published format: JP 23511298 | JP19980250250 | 04.09.1998 Original published format: JP 25025098 | JP19980287747 | 09.10.1998 Original published format: JP 28774798 | JP19980339772 | 30.11.1998 Original published format: JP 33977298 | JP19990064665 | 11.03.1999 Original published format: JP 6466599 | JP19990208138 | 22.07.1999 Original published format: JP 20813899 | [2001/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0010706 | Date: | 02.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1125636 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/02, B01J21/06, B01D53/86, C01G23/047, C02F1/72, C25B1/04, H01L31/04, B01J37/34, H01G9/20 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B01J21/063 (KR);
B01D53/8678 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/30 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/39 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/40 (KR);
B01J37/349 (EP,KR,US);
C01G23/043 (EP,US);
C01G23/047 (KR);
H01G9/2031 (EP,US);
B01D2255/802 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2257/404 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2002/86 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/34] | B01J35/02, B01J21/06, B01D53/86, C01G23/047, C02F1/72, C25B1/04, H01L31/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2001/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHOTOKATALYSATOR FÜR SICHTBARE STRAHLUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2001/34] | English: | VISIBLE RADIATION TYPE PHOTOCATALYST AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF | [2001/34] | French: | PHOTOCATALYSEUR DE TYPE A RAYONNEMENT VISIBLE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2001/34] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2001 | Translation filed | 20.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 29.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 07.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 19.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4228128 (ESPER MICHAEL J, et al) [X] 1,3 * column 6, line 25 - line 41 *; | [X]US4511638 (SAPRU KRISHNA [US], et al) [X] 1,12,23-26,28-36 * column 3, line 9 - line 17 * * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 54 *; | [X]US5389340 (SATAKE KAZUKO [JP]) [X] 1,12,23-26* column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 53 *; | [X]US5547649 (BECK DONALD D [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,24,25,28-32 * column 1, lines 34-41 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 23 * | International search | [Y]JPH04342964 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JPH0985099 (NIKON CORP); | [Y]JPH09234344 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN, et al); | [A]JPH10130112 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN); | [X]JPH10146530 (NIPPON ITA GLASS TECHNO RES KK); | [XP]JPH1112115 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN, et al); | [XP]JPH1147609 (SHARP KK, et al); | [AP]JPH11290697 (MATSUSHITA SEIKO KK) |