|
30.08.2006 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2003 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Communication regarding the forthcoming grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.02.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.02.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
07.02.2001 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.12.2000 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.11.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.11.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.11.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
29.11.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
29.11.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
29.11.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
29.11.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.11.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.09.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.09.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.09.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.09.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.07.2000 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.07.2000 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
28.07.2000 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
15.06.2000 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.06.2000 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.05.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/404 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.04.2000 |
Invitation to correct defects in demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.04.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.04.2000 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.03.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.03.2000 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.03.2000 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.03.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
14.03.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
14.03.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
09.03.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.03.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
06.10.1999 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.10.1999 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
06.10.1999 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
15 |
|
06.10.1999 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
6 |