Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1089782
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
08.08.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] |
13.06.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] |
16.08.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] |
24.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
02.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.02.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
08.10.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.06.2001 |
First examination report |
|
29.05.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.05.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
23.02.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.04.2001 [2001/15] |
23.02.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.04.2001 [2001/15] |
21.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.02.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
04.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.01.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|