Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002523188 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19840532 | 28.08.1998 | EP9906290 | 26.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5741899 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19840532 | 28.08.1998 | EP9906290 | 26.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1089782 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2002 | B1 | EP1089782 | 11.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19840532 | 28.08.1998 | EP9906290 | 26.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE225196T | 15.10.2002 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE19840532 | 28.08.1998 | EP9906290 | 26.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69903298T | 11.09.2003 | T2 | DE69903298D1 | 07.11.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19840532 | 28.08.1998 | DE69903298 | 26.08.1999 | EP9906290 | 26.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1089782T | 10.02.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19840532 | 28.08.1998 | EP9906290 | 26.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6966894 | 22.11.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE19840532 | 28.08.1998 | EP9906290 | 26.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0012158 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19840532 | 28.08.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19840532 | 09.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19840532 | 28.08.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2184499T | 01.04.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19840532 | 28.08.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1089782E | 28.02.2003 | E | Priority number | Date | DE19840532 | 28.08.1998 |