EP1089782 - SYRINGES AND INJECTORS INCORPORATING MECHANICAL FLUID AGITATION DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | [2001/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URICH, Klaus Parkstrasse 27a D-13129 Berlin / DE | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H., et al Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys., et al Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99944530.7 | 26.08.1999 | [2001/15] | WO1999EP06290 | Priority number, date | DE1998140532 | 28.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19840532 | [2001/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0012158 | Date: | 09.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1089782 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1089782 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/145, B01F11/00 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
A61M5/14546 (EP,US);
B01F33/25 (EP,US);
A61M1/0204 (EP,US);
B01F23/024 (EP,US);
B01F31/10 (EP,US);
B01F31/23 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/15] | Title | German: | SPRITZE UND INJEKTOR MIT MECHANISCHER RÜHRVORRICHTUNG | [2001/15] | English: | SYRINGES AND INJECTORS INCORPORATING MECHANICAL FLUID AGITATION DEVICES | [2001/15] | French: | SERINGUES ET INJECTEURS COMPRENANT DES DISPOSITIFS D'AGITATION DE FLUIDE MECANIQUE | [2001/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 07.02.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 01.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 02.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 02.10.2002 | [2003/31] | Cited in | International search | [X]US3789670 (ROSENWALD G) [X] 1,4,5,7,8,12-15,17,20,21,23,24,27-30,32,33 * column 3, line 35 - line 36; figure - *; | [A]US3880138 (WOOTTEN JOHN A, et al) [A] 17-33* column W *; | [X]US4687000 (EISENHARDT ANNE R [DK], et al) [X] 1,4-6 * abstract *; | [X]US5352036 (HABER TERRY M [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,13,14 * column A; figure - *; | [X]DE29622313U (TRICUMED GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4-6 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19625102 (SCHUCKMANN ALFRED VON [DE]) [X] 1-4,7 * column W *; | [A]WO9822168 (LIEBEL FLARSHEIM CO [US]) [A] 17-33 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0584531 | WO9600098 |