30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
12.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
22.02.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] |
18.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
11.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
21.12.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] |
30.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
09.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
02.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
16.03.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] |
24.02.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
09.02.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.02.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.11.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.10.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
07.10.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
27.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.09.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.05.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.02.2008 |
First examination report |
|
06.02.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.10.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.09.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] |
18.08.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
01.11.2002 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] |
25.09.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.04.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
19.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.06.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.07.2001 [2001/30] |
08.06.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.07.2001 [2001/30] |
01.06.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.04.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|