Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4694691B | Global Dossier | 08.06.2011 | B2 | JP2002524315 | 06.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | SE9901501 | 01.09.1999 | SE9802967 | 03.09.1998 | SE9803756 | 04.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5893899 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | SE9901501 | 01.09.1999 | SE9802967 | 03.09.1998 | SE9803756 | 04.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1117869 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2012 | B1 | EP1117869 | 25.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9901501 | 01.09.1999 | SE9802967 | 03.09.1998 | SE9803756 | 04.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE553919T | 15.05.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | SE9901501 | 01.09.1999 | SE9802967 | 03.09.1998 | SE9803756 | 04.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9913134 | 07.02.2012 | B1 | BR9913134 | 08.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | SE9901501 | 01.09.1999 | SE9802967 | 03.09.1998 | SE9803756 | 04.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2342227 | 24.03.2009 | C | CA2342227 | 16.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9901501 | 01.09.1999 | SE9802967 | 03.09.1998 | SE9803756 | 04.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2386805T | 31.08.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | SE9901501 | 01.09.1999 | SE9802967 | 03.09.1998 | SE9803756 | 04.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ510171 | 29.04.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | SE9901501 | 01.09.1999 | SE9802967 | 03.09.1998 | SE9803756 | 04.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL199323B | 30.09.2008 | B1 | PL346425 | 11.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9901501 | 01.09.1999 | SE9802967 | 03.09.1998 | SE9803756 | 04.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE512776 | 15.05.2000 | C2 | SE9802967L | 04.03.2000 | L | SE9802967D0 | 03.09.1998 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE9802967 | 03.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE9803756D0 | 04.11.1998 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE9803756 | 04.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6537680 | 25.03.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | SE9901501 | 01.09.1999 | SE9802967 | 03.09.1998 | SE9803756 | 04.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0014333 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9802967 | 03.09.1998 | SE9803756 | 04.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1136362C | 28.01.2004 | C | CN1316030 | 03.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | SE9802967 | 03.09.1998 | SE9803756 | 04.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2202021 | 10.04.2003 | C2 | Priority number | Date | SE9802967 | 03.09.1998 | SE9803756 | 04.11.1998 |