EP1117869 - PAPER OR PAPERBOARD LAMINATE AND METHOD TO PRODUCE SUCH A LAMINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stora Enso Aktiebolag 791 80 Falun / SE | [2012/13] |
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states Stora Enso Aktiebolag Asgatan 22 791 80 Falun / SE | ||
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states STORA KOPPARBERGS BERGSLAGS AKTIEBOLAG(publ) Asgatan 22 S-791 80 Falun / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORLANDER, Leif Länsmansvägen 7 S-791 61 Falun / SE | 02 /
KARLSSON, Annika Terrängstigen 6 S-784 68 Borlänge / SE | 03 /
FREDLUND, Mats Edebäcksgatan 43A S-654 61 Karlstad / SE | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Johansson, Lars-Erik, et al Hynell Intellectual Property AB Hammarbybacken 27 120 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Johansson, Lars-Erik, et al Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Uddeholm / SE | ||
Former [2005/45] | Johansson, Lars-Erik, et al Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors / Uddeholm / SE | ||
Former [2002/51] | Johansson, Lars E., et al Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls Väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/30] | Hynell, Magnus Hynell Patenttjänst AB, Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 99946544.6 | 01.09.1999 | [2001/30] | WO1999SE01501 | Priority number, date | SE19980002967 | 03.09.1998 Original published format: SE 9802967 | SE19980003756 | 04.11.1998 Original published format: SE 9803756 | [2001/30] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0014333 | Date: | 16.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1117869 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1117869 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B32B29/00, D21F11/04, D21H27/38 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
B32B29/00 (EP,US);
B32B29/005 (US);
D21F11/04 (EP,US);
D21H27/38 (EP,US);
B32B2250/26 (US);
D21H11/02 (EP,US);
D21H11/08 (EP,US);
D21H11/10 (EP,US);
D21H11/18 (EP,US);
D21H13/14 (EP,US);
D21H13/24 (EP,US);
D21H19/04 (EP,US);
D21H19/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31971 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31975 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31978 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31982 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31986 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31993 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/30] | D21H27/38, B65D65/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/30] | Title | German: | PAPIER-ODER KARTONLAMINAT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2001/30] | English: | PAPER OR PAPERBOARD LAMINATE AND METHOD TO PRODUCE SUCH A LAMINATE | [2001/30] | French: | PAPIER OU CARTON STRATIFIE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2001/30] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.1999 | Translation filed | 05.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 06.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.04.2012 | BE | 18.04.2012 | CY | 18.04.2012 | DK | 18.04.2012 | NL | 18.04.2012 | GR | 19.07.2012 | PT | 20.08.2012 | IE | 01.09.2012 | LU | 01.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/33] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 01.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 18.04.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH633482 (WALDHOF ASCHAFFENBURG PAPIER [DE]); | [A]SE445937 (BILLERUDS AB [SE]); | [A]US4913773 (KNUDSEN KEITH W [US], et al); | [A]US5080758 (HORNG ARBEIT J [CA]); | [A]WO9526441 (WEYERHAEUSER CO [US]); | [A]WO9719198 (SCA HYGIENE PAPER AB [SE], et al); | [AP]WO9902777 (STORA KOPPARBERGS BERGSLAGS AB [SE], et al) | by applicant | GB1430760 | GB1435703 | US4914773 | WO9526441 | - "An introduction to dry forming of paper", TAPPI, (1978), pages 3 - 6 | - "Where research pays off", PPI, (197703), pages 42 - 26 | - "Dry forming of paperboard: a look at its history and technology", PULP AND PAPER, (1980), vol. 54, no. 4, pages 120 - 123 | - FELLERS, NORMAN, Pappersteknik, third edition,, (1996), pages 315 - 318 | SE19900000515 |