EP1137397 - WASHING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2001/40] | For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECCLESON, Graham C., Unilever Res. Port Sunlight Quarry Road East, Bebington Wirral, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 02 /
FAIRLEY, Peter, Unilever Research Port Sunlight Quarry Road East, Bebington Wirral, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 03 /
LAM, Stanley 100 Devon Avenue, Apt. 51 Pleasent Hill, CA CA 94523 / US | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | James, Helen Sarah, et al Unilever PLC Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | Griffiths, Helen Sarah, et al Unilever PLC, Patent Division, Colworth House Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99958146.5 | 29.11.1999 | [2001/40] | WO1999EP09328 | Priority number, date | GB19980027224 | 10.12.1998 Original published format: GB 9827224 | [2001/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0033807 | Date: | 15.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1137397 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1137397 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/50, A61K7/48, A61K7/06 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K8/737 (EP,US);
A61K8/892 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
A61K2800/5426 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2001/40] | English: | WASHING COMPOSITIONS | [2001/40] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE LAVAGE | [2001/40] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/40] | 17.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2003 | Observations by third parties | 05.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.02.2004 | CH | 04.02.2004 | CY | 04.02.2004 | FI | 04.02.2004 | IT | 04.02.2004 | LI | 04.02.2004 | DK | 04.05.2004 | SE | 04.05.2004 | PT | 04.07.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 04.02.2004 | |
CH | 04.02.2004 | ||
CY | 04.02.2004 | ||
FI | 04.02.2004 | ||
LI | 04.02.2004 | ||
DK | 04.05.2004 | ||
SE | 04.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 04.02.2004 | |
CH | 04.02.2004 | ||
FI | 04.02.2004 | ||
LI | 04.02.2004 | ||
DK | 04.05.2004 | ||
SE | 04.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 04.02.2004 | |
CH | 04.02.2004 | ||
FI | 04.02.2004 | ||
LI | 04.02.2004 | ||
SE | 04.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 04.02.2004 | |
FI | 04.02.2004 | ||
SE | 04.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 04.02.2004 | |
SE | 04.05.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XA]GB1111708 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [X] 1,2,5,6 * claim - * * example - * * page 2, line 13 - line 65 * * page 4, line 71 - line 84 * [A] 7; | [XA]GB1228060 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [X] 1,5,6 * claim - * * example 1 * * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 32 * * page 5, line 53 - page 6, line 77 * [A] 7; | [DA]EP0432951 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [DA] 1-5 * claim - * * example - * * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 28 *; | [DA]EP0498119 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [DA] 1-5 * claim - * * example - * * page 5, line 33 - line 42 *; | [DA]WO9522311 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [DA] 1-3,5 * claim - * * example - * * page 6, line 4 - page 7, line 32 *; | [XA]WO9617592 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,3-6 * claims 1-6 * * example - * * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 19 * * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 22 * * page 16, line 9 - line 21 * * page 17, line 23 - line 29 * [A] 4,7; | [DA]WO9748378 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [DA] 1,2,4-6 * claim - * * example - * * page 3, line 1 - page 7, line 8 *; | [A]WO9748375 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,2,4-6 * claim - ** example - *; | [A]WO9818432 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5 * claim - * * example - * * page 9, line 7 - page 14, line 33 * | other | US3580853 | EP0386898 |