Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1116298
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
13.02.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] |
31.10.2003 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.10.2003 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.05.2003 |
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution |
published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] |
30.10.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
19.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.07.2001 |
Change - inventor |
published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] |
05.07.2001 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.06.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] |
01.06.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] |
25.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.04.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|