Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003227350 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42748303 | 30.04.2003 | US49912700 | 07.02.2000 | US15863198 | 22.09.1998 | US87472501 | 05.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010074423 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US15863198 | 22.09.1998 | US9921184 | 14.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002527973 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US15863198 | 22.09.1998 | US9921184 | 14.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2471800 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US15863198 | 22.09.1998 | US9921184 | 14.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1116298 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US15863198 | 22.09.1998 | US9921184 | 14.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2349171 | 20.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15863198 | 22.09.1998 | US9921184 | 14.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1043879 | 27.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15863198 | 22.09.1998 | US9921184 | 14.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6731960 | 04.05.2004 | B2 | US2001025013 | 27.09.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15863198 | 22.09.1998 | US87472501 | 05.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2001038320 | 08.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US49912700 | 07.02.2000 | US15863198 | 22.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0022691 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2000 | A3 | WO0022691 | 24.08.2000 | A9 | WO0022691 | 20.04.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US15863198 | 22.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1348618 | 08.05.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US15863198 | 22.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6314309 | 06.11.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US15863198 | 22.09.1998 |