Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2236474 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 95
10.04.2013 Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore Search / examination 1
19.02.2013 Request for change of address of the applicant Search / examination 1
07.12.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
06.09.2011 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
19.05.2011 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
11.10.2010 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.09.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
25.08.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.08.2010 Declaration that a search is not possible Search / examination 2
25.08.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 1
12.07.2010 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
07.07.2010 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
02.07.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
30.04.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
30.04.2010 Invitation to indicate the subject-matter to be searched Search / examination 2
06.04.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
05.02.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.02.2010 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
05.02.2010 Annex Search / examination 1
05.02.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
05.02.2010 Description Search / examination 28
05.02.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.02.2010 Drawings Search / examination 2
05.02.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4