Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2236474

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure19.05.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2011/41]
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:06.10.2010 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:12.10.2011 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20110407
 
Event date:03.02.2011 
Event description:UTILITY MODEL SPECIFICATION
Effective DATE:20110203
 
Event date:25.04.2013 
Event description:TERM OF PROTECTION EXTENDED TO 6 YEARS
Effective DATE:20130307
 
Event date:01.03.2016 
Event description:TERM OF PROTECTION EXTENDED TO 8 YEARS
 
Event date:05.03.2018 
Event description:TERM OF PROTECTION EXTENDED TO 10 YEARS
 
Event date:01.09.2010 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:01.09.2010 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA RS
 
Event date:04.05.2011 
Event description:NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID
 
Event date:28.09.2011 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20110302