Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1394834

EP1394834 - Method of obtaining an image of a sample in a particle-optical device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  16.09.2016
Database last updated on 18.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.09.2016Opposition rejectedpublished on 19.10.2016  [2016/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FEI COMPANY
5350 NE Dawson Creek Drive
Hillsboro, Oregon 97124-5793 / US
[2007/04]
Former [2004/10]For all designated states
FEI Company
5350 NE Dawson Creek Drive
Hillsboro, Oregon 97124-5793 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Geurts, Remco Theodorus Johannes Petrus
Amsteleindstraat 42
5345 AW Oss / NL
02 / Hayles, Michael Frederick
Provencehof 11
5627 HA Eindhoven / NL
 [2004/10]
Representative(s)DeltaPatents B.V.
Fellenoord 370
5611 ZL Eindhoven / NL
[2008/20]
Former [2008/01]Bakker, Hendrik , et al
FEI Company Patent Department P.O. Box 1745
5602 BS Eindhoven / NL
Former [2006/42]Bakker, Hendrik , et al
FEI Company Patent Department P.O. Box 80066
5600 KA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2004/10]Bakker, Hendrik
FEI Company Achtseweg Noord 5, Building AAE-48
5651 GG Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date03077738.701.09.2003
[2004/10]
Priority number, dateNL2002102137602.09.2002         Original published format: NL 1021376
[2004/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1394834
Date:03.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1394834
Date:16.11.2005
[2005/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1394834
Date:24.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP29.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:H01J37/305, G01N1/32, G01N1/42, H01J37/28, H01J37/02
[2005/46]
Former International [2004/10]H01J37/305, G01N1/32, G01N1/42
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2006/29]
Former [2004/10]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Erzeugung einer Abbildung einer Probe in einer teilchen-optischen Vorrichtung[2004/10]
English:Method of obtaining an image of a sample in a particle-optical device[2004/10]
French:Méthode pour obtenir une image d'un échantillon dans un dispositif d'optique corpusculaire[2004/10]
Examination procedure01.09.2003Examination requested  [2004/10]
07.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2006Fee for grant paid
04.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.10.2007  30.10.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Zeiss Microscopy GmbH
Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10
07745 Jena / DE
Opponent's representative
Gnatzig, Klaus, et al
Carl Zeiss
Patentabteilung
73446 Oberkochen / DE
 [2016/28]
Former [2007/48]
Opponent(s)01  24.10.2007   
Carl Zeiss NTS GmbH
Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 56
73447 Oberkochen / DE
Opponent's representative
Gnatzig, Klaus, et al
Carl Zeiss Patentabteilung
73446 Oberkochen / DE
03.12.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.03.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.01.2010Date of oral proceedings
08.03.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.03.2010Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
05.07.2016Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2016/42]
Appeal following opposition12.05.2010Appeal received No.  T1123/10
12.07.2010Statement of grounds filed
05.07.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
05.07.2016Date of oral proceedings
20.07.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL24.01.2007
[2007/40]
Documents cited:Search[Y]US3761709  (HASEGAWA Y, et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 22; figures 1-7 *;
 [Y]US6046457  (BOHNENKAMP CARL E [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 2, lines 39-48; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US5274237  (GALLAGHER BRIAN W [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9828459  (GATAN INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 4, line 28 - page 10, line 22; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US3505521  (WEGMANN LIENHARD, et al) [A] 1-9 * column 4, lines 5-30; figures 1-9 *;
 [X]US4759868  (CLARKE DAVID E [GB]) [X] 9 * column 3, lines 25-63; figure 4 *;
 [X]US5986270  (BORMANS BERNARDUS J M [NL], et al) [X] 9 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 53; figures 1-4 *