Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1490411

EP1490411 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE STABILITY OF EMULSIONS AND STABILIZED EMULSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.02.2018New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RHODIA CHIMIE
25, quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92512 Boulogne-Billancourt Cedex / FR
[2009/04]
Former [2005/01]For all designated states
Rhodia Chimie
25, quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92512 Boulogne-Billancourt Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / JOANICOT, Mathieu
177, avenue Jean-Jaurès
F-92290 Chatenay-Malabry / FR
02 / KIPLINGER, Jon, D.
4 Lincoln Drive
Columbus, JN 08022 / US
03 / MORVAN, Mikel
21 Heritage Boulevard
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
04 / ADAM, Hervé
75 Fair Acres Court
Princeton, NJ 8540 / US
 [2008/37]
Former [2005/04]01 / JOANICOT, Mathieu
177, avenue Jean-Jaurès
F-92290 Chatenay-Malabry / FR
02 / KIPLINGER, Jon, D.
4 Lincoln Drivee
Columbus, JN 08022 / US
03 / MORVAN, Mikel
21 Heritage Boulevard
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
04 / ADAM, Hervé
75 Fair Acres Court
Princeton, NJ 8540 / US
Former [2005/01]01 / JOANICOT, Mathieu
177, avenue Jean-Jaurès
F-92290 Chatenay-Malabry / FR
02 / KIPLINGER, Jon, D.
18 Spruce Avenue
Bordentown, NJ 08506 / US
03 / MORVAN, Mikel
21 Heritage Boulevard
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
04 / ADAM, Hervé
75 Fair Acres Court
Princeton, NJ 8540 / US
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2011/14]
Former [2011/14]Cordier, Pascal Christian , et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2010/17]Cordier, Pascal Christian , et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2010/17]Boittiaux, Vincent
Rhodia Services Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 40, rue de la Haie-Coq
93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR
Former [2005/01]Boittiaux, Vincent
Rhodia Services, DPI, 40, rue de la Haie-Coq
93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date03739465.711.02.2003
[2005/01]
WO2003EP01313
Priority number, dateUS20020356066P11.02.2002         Original published format: US 356066 P
[2005/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03068827
Date:21.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1490411
Date:29.12.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2003
[2005/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1490411
Date:21.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:C08F2/22
[2005/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/01]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REGULIERUNG DER STABILITÄT VON EMULSIONEN UND STABILISIERTEN EMULSIONEN[2005/01]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE STABILITY OF EMULSIONS AND STABILIZED EMULSIONS[2005/01]
French:PROCEDE DE REGULATION DE LA STABILITE D'EMULSIONS ET EMULSIONS STABILISEES[2005/01]
Entry into regional phase11.08.2004National basic fee paid 
11.08.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.08.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/53]
13.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
27.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2008Fee for grant paid
26.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.10.2009   
BASF SE
Global Intellectual Property
GVX-C006
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/48]
Opponent(s)01  19.10.2009   
BASF SE
Global Intellectual Property GVX-C006
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
27.11.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.06.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.03.2012Date of oral proceedings
04.04.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.04.2012Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
12.04.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
22.04.2017Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/24]
Appeal following opposition04.06.2012Appeal received No.  T1277/12
02.08.2012Statement of grounds filed
Petition(s) for review:19.05.2017Petition for review received
 Number:  R0004/17
 for appeal No.  T1277/12-3303
 Petitioner:  APPR
29.01.2018Decision:  Petition for review allowed and re-opening of appeal procedure with total refund of fee for petition for review.
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CY21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
IT21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
TR21.01.2009
IE11.02.2009
LU11.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
BG21.04.2009
SE21.04.2009
GR22.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
HU22.07.2009
[2015/21]
Former [2011/31]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
IT21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
IE11.02.2009
LU11.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
BG21.04.2009
SE21.04.2009
GR22.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
HU22.07.2009
Former [2011/21]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
IT21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
IE11.02.2009
LU11.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
BG21.04.2009
SE21.04.2009
GR22.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
Former [2011/14]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
IT21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
IE11.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
BG21.04.2009
SE21.04.2009
GR22.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
Former [2010/48]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
IE11.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
BG21.04.2009
SE21.04.2009
GR22.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
Former [2010/08]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
IE11.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
BG21.04.2009
SE21.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
Former [2010/07]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
IE11.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
SE21.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
Former [2009/50]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SK21.01.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
SE21.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
Former [2009/49]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
CZ21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
EE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
SE21.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
Former [2009/47]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
SE21.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
Former [2009/46]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
DK21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
MC28.02.2009
SE21.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
Former [2009/43]AT21.01.2009
BE21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
MC28.02.2009
SE21.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
Former [2009/39]AT21.01.2009
FI21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
SE21.04.2009
ES02.05.2009
PT22.06.2009
Former [2009/36]FI21.01.2009
SI21.01.2009
ES02.05.2009
Former [2009/34]ES02.05.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0047631  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-23 * claim 1 *;
 [X]FR2270268  (ANVAR [FR]) [X] 1-23 * example 1 *;
 [DA]WO0012660  (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH [US], et al)