Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2384082

EP2384082 - Method and device for configuring a network of remote wireless sensors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/44]Method and device for configuring a network of removed wireless sensors
[2016/10]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 20.09.2017  [2017/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thales
45, rue de Villiers
92200 Neuilly Sur Seine / FR
[2011/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Leguay, Jérémie
160, boulevard de Valmy BP 82
92704, COLOMBES Cedex / FR
02 / Gay, Vincent
160, boulevard de Valmy BP 82
92704, COLOMBES Cedex / FR
03 / Lopez-Ramos, Mario
160, boulevard de Valmy BP 82
92704, COLOMBES Cedex / FR
04 / Medagliani, Paolo
Via Giuseppina, 47
26042, CINGIA DE'BOTTI (CR) / IT
05 / Ferrari, GianLuigi
Via Signorelli, 16
43124, PARMA / IT
 [2011/44]
Representative(s)Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[2016/33]
Former [2011/44]Blot, Philippe Robert Emile
Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date11305500.828.04.2011
[2011/44]
Priority number, dateFR2010000186930.04.2010         Original published format: FR 1001869
[2011/44]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2384082
Date:02.11.2011
Language:FR
[2011/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2384082
Date:17.08.2016
Language:FR
[2016/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP08.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04W88/18, H04W16/18
[2016/10]
Former International [2011/44]H04W88/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/33]
Former [2011/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Konfiguration eines kabellosen Sensornetzes[2016/10]
English:Method and device for configuring a network of remote wireless sensors[2016/10]
French:Procédé et dispositif de configuration d'un réseau de capteurs sans fils[2016/10]
Former [2011/44]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Konfiguration eines Sensornetzes ohne verlegte Kabel
Former [2011/44]Method and device for configuring a network of removed wireless sensors
Former [2011/44]Procédé et dispositif de configuration d'un réseau de capteurs sans fils déposés
Examination procedure27.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/10]
08.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2016Fee for grant paid
04.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.03.2016
Opposition(s)18.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
[2017/37]
Former [2017/32]AT17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/13]AT17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/11]AT17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT17.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[AD]  MEDAGLIANI P ET AL, "Engineering Energy-Efficient Target Detection Applications in Wireless Sensor Networks", LARGE-SCALE CONTEXT MANAGEMENT, IEEE, US, (20100329), ISBN 978-1-4244-5328-3, pages 31 - 39, XP007915674 [AD] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [A]  KAPLAN L M, "Node selection for target tracking using bearing measurements from unattended ground sensors", AEROSPACE CONFERENCE, 2003. PROCEEDINGS. 2003 IEEE MARCH 8-15, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20030308), vol. 5, ISBN 978-0-7803-7651-9, pages 5_2137 - 5_2152, XP010660508 [A] 1,8,9 * abstract *
 [A]  "Decentralized Management of Sensors in a Multi-Attribute Environment Under Weak Network Congestion", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2006. ICASSP 2006 PROCEEDINGS . 2006 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TOULOUSE, FRANCE 14-19 MAY 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20060101), ISBN 978-1-4244-0469-8, pages IV - IV, XP031101375 [A] 1,8,9 * abstract *
by applicant   DANS T. HE, S. KRISHNAMURTHY, L. LUO, T. YAN, L. GU, R. STOLERU, G. ZHOU, Q. CAO, P. VICAIRE, J. A. STANKOVIC, "Vigilnet: An integrated sensor network system for energy-efficient surveillance", ACM TRANS. SEN. NETW., (200602), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 1 - 38,
    J. JEONG, Y. GU, T. HE, D. DU, "VISA: Virtual Scanning Algorithm for Dynamic Protection of Road Networks", PROC. OF 28TH IEEE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS (INFOCOM 09, (200904),
    L. LAZOS, R. POOVENDRAN, J. A. RITCEY, "Analytic evaluation of target detection in heterogeneous wireless sensor networks", ACM TRANS. SENSOR NETWORKS, (200903), vol. 5, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1145/1498915.1498924, pages 1 - 38, XP058033702

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1498915.1498924
    P. MEDAGLIANI, J. LEGUAY, V. GAY, M. LOPEZ RAMOS, G. FERRARI, "Engineering Energy-Efficient Target Detection Applications in Wireless Sensor Networks", CONFERENCE IEEE PERCOM 2010, (201003),
    J.J. SYLVESTER, "On a funicular solution of Buffon's "problem of the needle" in its most general form", ACTA MATHEMATICA, (1890), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 185 - 205,