blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1018414

EP1018414 - Knife ring cutter for cutting chips [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.05.2005
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.05.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.06.2005  [2005/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
B. Maier Zerkleinerungstechnik GmbH
Postfach 14 06 60
33626 Bielefeld / DE
[2004/28]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
B. Maier Zerkleinerungstechnik GmbH
Postfach 14 06 40
33626 Bielefeld / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Loth, Robert
Kameruner Strasse 9a
32791 Lage-Müssen / DE
02 / Ameling, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing.
Blackenfeld 74c
33739 Bielefeld / DE
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Application number, filing date00100016.503.01.2000
[2000/28]
Priority number, dateDE199910056609.01.1999         Original published format: DE 19900566
[2000/28]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1018414
Date:12.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1018414
Date:07.07.2004
Language:DE
[2004/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2000
ClassificationIPC:B27L11/00, B02C13/28
[2000/28]
CPC:
B27L11/005 (EP,US); B02C18/144 (EP,US); B02C18/18 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/13]
Former [2000/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Messerring-Zerspaner zum Zerspanen von Hackschnitzeln[2000/28]
English:Knife ring cutter for cutting chips[2000/28]
French:Déchiqueteuse à lames-couronne pour couper des coupeaux[2000/28]
Examination procedure30.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
21.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2004Fee for grant paid
29.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2616849  (PALLMANN KG MASCHF) [A] 1 * figure 4 *;
 [A]US1424225  (WILLIAMS MILTON F) [A] 1 * figures 1,5 *
by applicantDE3247629
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.