Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1022641 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1022641



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 5775
05.06.2015 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
29.05.2015 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
15.05.2015 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
15.05.2015 French translation of claims Opposition 2
15.05.2015 German translation of the claims Opposition 1
05.02.2015 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 5
29.01.2015 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 8
27.12.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.12.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.12.2014 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 24
22.12.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
11.12.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
02.12.2014 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
02.12.2014 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 2
21.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.11.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.11.2014 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 3
21.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.11.2014 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 1
02.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
02.10.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
02.10.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
02.10.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
02.10.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
05.08.2014 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
04.08.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
31.07.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
31.07.2014 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 11
28.07.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.06.2014 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
10.02.2014 F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent Appeal 2
04.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.02.2014 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
19.11.2013 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.07.2013 F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent Appeal 3
05.07.2013 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 1
26.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
06.06.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
18.03.2013 Submission concerning representation Appeal 3
06.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 2
06.09.2012 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 2
06.09.2012 Communication of amended entries Appeal 1
07.08.2012 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 7
20.04.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
14.04.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
11.04.2011 Reply to appeal Appeal 78
08.04.2011 Reply to appeal Appeal 78
06.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
06.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
06.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 94
06.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
06.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.04.2011 Reply to appeal Appeal 121
07.03.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
03.03.2011 Claims Appeal 2
03.03.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
01.03.2011 Claims Appeal 2
01.03.2011 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.11.2010 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 3
30.11.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.11.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.11.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 28
24.11.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 28
19.11.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
19.11.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
19.11.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
19.11.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 92
18.11.2010 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
16.11.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
15.11.2010 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
15.11.2010 Claims Appeal 28
15.11.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 40
12.11.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
08.11.2010 Submission concerning change of applicant's address Appeal 9
26.08.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
25.08.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
20.08.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
06.08.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
06.08.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
30.07.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
30.07.2010 Processing of an appeal Opposition 2
29.07.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
27.07.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
23.07.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.07.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.07.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.07.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.07.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 24
14.07.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Search / examination 2
14.07.2010 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 31
14.07.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 23
14.07.2010 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
14.07.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.07.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.07.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
14.07.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
14.07.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.05.2010 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
19.04.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 11
19.04.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 14
19.04.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 24
19.04.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 31
19.04.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
19.04.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
19.04.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 44
19.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 66
19.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
19.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
19.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
19.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
13.04.2010 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
13.04.2010 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
13.04.2010 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
13.04.2010 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
13.04.2010 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
13.04.2010 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
13.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
13.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
13.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
13.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
13.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
13.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
13.04.2010 Claims Opposition 2
13.04.2010 Description Opposition 1
13.04.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 57
13.04.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.04.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
13.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.04.2010 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
19.03.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.03.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.01.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.01.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.01.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.01.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.01.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.01.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.12.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.12.2009 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.12.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.12.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.12.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.12.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.12.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.12.2009 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
18.12.2009 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
16.12.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.12.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.12.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 17
09.12.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.12.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.12.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.07.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 83
10.07.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 18
10.07.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
10.07.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 15
10.07.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 67
10.07.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
10.07.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
10.07.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
10.07.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
10.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
10.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
10.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
10.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
10.07.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
04.06.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
27.05.2009 Submission concerning change of applicant's address Opposition 4
21.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.10.2008 Claims Opposition 2
02.10.2008 Claims Opposition 2
02.10.2008 Claims Opposition 2
02.10.2008 Claims Opposition 2
02.10.2008 Claims Opposition 2
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 55
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 146
02.10.2008 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
02.10.2008 Non-scannable object Opposition 68
02.10.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 46
01.10.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 10
01.10.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
01.10.2008 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2008 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2008 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2008 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2008 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 2
01.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 55
01.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 65
01.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
01.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
01.10.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
01.10.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 79
01.10.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 114
01.08.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.08.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.08.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
25.07.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
25.07.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
03.06.2008 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.06.2008 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.06.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
19.05.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
13.03.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.03.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
05.03.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.02.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
28.02.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
28.02.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.01.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
22.01.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.01.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
15.01.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.01.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.01.2008 Request for documents Opposition 1
28.12.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.12.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.12.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
18.12.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 39
18.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
18.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
18.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 52
18.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
18.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
18.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
18.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
18.12.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
18.12.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
18.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
18.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
18.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
18.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 140
18.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
18.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
18.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
18.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
18.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
18.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
18.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
18.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
18.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
18.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
18.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
18.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
07.12.2007 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 38
07.12.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 1
07.12.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
06.12.2007 Authorisation Opposition 1
06.12.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 62
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 148
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 63
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 221
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 47
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 47
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 45
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 45
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 139
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
06.12.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 49
08.02.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.01.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.01.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
26.01.2007 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
19.01.2007 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
18.01.2007 Communication regarding the forthcoming grant Search / examination 1
12.01.2007 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
12.01.2007 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
09.01.2007 Description Search / examination 1
09.01.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
09.01.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
09.01.2007 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
22.12.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
22.12.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
22.12.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 77
28.11.2006 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.11.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
31.10.2006 Annex Search / examination 24
31.10.2006 Annex Search / examination 11
31.10.2006 Annex Search / examination 14
31.10.2006 Annex Search / examination 44
31.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
31.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
31.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
31.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
31.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
31.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
31.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
31.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
31.10.2006 Description Search / examination 63
31.10.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 9
30.10.2006 Annex Search / examination 11
30.10.2006 Annex Search / examination 44
30.10.2006 Annex Search / examination 24
30.10.2006 Annex Search / examination 14
30.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
30.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
30.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
30.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
30.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
30.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
30.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
30.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
30.10.2006 Description Search / examination 63
30.10.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.10.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.10.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 9
12.09.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
06.09.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 9
06.09.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.09.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
01.03.2006 Data sheet for the decision Search / examination 22
28.02.2006 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 25
28.12.2005 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 5
27.12.2005 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 5
13.12.2005 Adjournment of examination/opposition proceedings Search / examination 1
13.12.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
04.11.2005 Claims Search / examination 3
04.11.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.08.2004 Claims Search / examination 4
27.08.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
26.08.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 11
19.03.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.03.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.03.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.02.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.01.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.10.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
16.10.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.09.2003 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.09.2003 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.09.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
04.08.2001 Request for change of address Search / examination 2
15.06.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
05.06.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
05.06.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.06.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
30.03.2000 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
29.03.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.03.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.03.2000 Description Search / examination 62
29.03.2000 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
15.03.2000 Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
10.02.2000 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
09.02.2000 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
20.01.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
04.01.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.01.2000 Annex Search / examination 6
04.01.2000 Claims Search / examination 5
04.01.2000 Description Search / examination 124
04.01.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.01.2000 Drawings Search / examination 11
04.01.2000 Request for accelerated search Search / examination 1
04.01.2000 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 6
31.10.1991 Priority document Search / examination 144