Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018672

EP1018672 - Process for producing electrophotographic photosensitive member [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  18.08.2006
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2006Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 20.09.2006  [2006/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawamorita, Yoichi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Soma, Takao, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/28]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/34]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2001/14]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/28]Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date00100073.605.01.2000
[2000/28]
Priority number, dateJP1999000340608.01.1999         Original published format: JP 340699
JP1999000340708.01.1999         Original published format: JP 340799
JP1999000340808.01.1999         Original published format: JP 340899
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1018672
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:G03G5/05
[2000/28]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/13]
Former [2000/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines elektrophotographischen lichtempfindlichen Elementes[2000/28]
English:Process for producing electrophotographic photosensitive member[2000/28]
French:Procédé de fabrication d' un élément photosensible électrophotographique[2000/28]
Examination procedure23.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/03]
28.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.08.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2006/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH07289870  ;
 [A]JPH06138682  ;
 [A]JPS63139355  ;
 [A]JPH03211559  ;
 [A]JPS63313164  ;
 [A]JPH03196049  ;
 [A]JPS6175359
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 02, Database accession no. 1996-015629, XP002134729 & JPH07289870 A 19951107 (CANON) [X] 1-16,18 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 25, Database accession no. 1994-203110, XP002134730 & JPH06138682 A 19940520 (CANON) [A] 12-14 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881024), vol. 12, no. 399, Database accession no. (P - 775), & JP63139355 A 19880611 (CANON) [A] 16 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911210), vol. 15, no. 487, Database accession no. (P - 1286), & JP03211559 A 19910917 (CANON) [A] 16 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890413), vol. 13, no. 152, Database accession no. (P - 856), & JP63313164 A 19881221 (CANON) [A] 16 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911121), vol. 15, no. 460, Database accession no. (P - 1278), & JP03196049 A 19910827 (CANON) [A] 16 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860826), vol. 10, no. 247, Database accession no. (P - 490), & JP61075359 A 19860417 (CANON) [A] 16 * abstract *