Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018528

EP1018528 - Polycarbonate resin and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.02.2006
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.02.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.03.2006  [2006/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC.
5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC.
5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-Ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fujimori, Takayasu, Corporate Research Laboratory
Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc., 22 Wadai
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken 300-4247 / JP
02 / Nakamura, Kenichi, Corporate Research Laboratory
Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc., 22 Wadai
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken 300-4247 / JP
03 / Hirata, Masukazu, Corporate Research Laboratory
Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc., 22 Wadai
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken 300-4247 / JP
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date00100114.805.01.2000
[2000/28]
Priority number, dateJP1999000338208.01.1999         Original published format: JP 338299
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1018528
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1018528
Date:04.10.2001
[2001/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1018528
Date:30.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:C08G64/02, C08G64/16
[2000/28]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/26]
Former [2000/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Polycarbonat und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[2000/28]
English:Polycarbonate resin and process for producing the same[2000/28]
French:Résine de polycarbonate et procédé de sa préparation[2000/28]
Examination procedure08.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/16]
22.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.11.2004Fee for grant paid
24.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS58173125  ;
 [A]US4910283  (KAWAKI TAKAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * column A; example 1 * * column 1, line 6 - line 15 *;
 [D]JPS6466234  (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO);
 [A]EP0357073  (KURARAY CO [JP]) [A] 1-11 * examples 3,7,16; claim 1 * * page 4, line 42 - page 6, line 54 * * page 7, line 44 - page 8, line 31 *;
 [A]JPH01223121  ;
 JPS58174419  [ ] (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD);
 [A]JPH0224308
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840107), vol. 008, no. 003, Database accession no. (C - 203), & JP58173125 A 19831012 (NIPPON GOSEI GOMU KK) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 42, Database accession no. 1989-303759, XP002174025 & JPH01223121 A 19890906 (TOSOH CORP) [A] 1,4,6,8 * abstract *
 [A]  - CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 100:139805/DN, HCAPLUS, URL: STN, XP002174024 [A] 1 * abstract * * RN 89254-71-7 *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 10, Database accession no. 1990-071296, XP002174003 & JPH0224308 A 19900126 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *