Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1072470

EP1072470 - Universal clamp for fixing a cross-member to the longitudinal rails on a vehicle roof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.09.2003  [2003/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FABBRI S.r.l.
Via Ospitaletto, 29/31
I-25040 Bornato Cazzago S. Martino (Brescia) / IT
[2001/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Fabbri Corsarini, Luciano
Via Bellavista 3
25017 Sedena Di Lonato (Brescia) / IT
 [2001/05]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/05]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date00100136.107.01.2000
[2001/05]
Priority number, dateIT1999MI0168629.07.1999         Original published format: IT MI991686
[2001/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1072470
Date:31.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1072470
Date:22.08.2001
[2001/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:B60R9/045
[2001/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/05]
TitleGerman:Universalklemme zur Befestigung eines Querträgers an einer länglichen Fahrzeugdachreling[2001/05]
English:Universal clamp for fixing a cross-member to the longitudinal rails on a vehicle roof[2001/05]
French:Serre universelle pour la fixation d'une traverse sur une barre de toit longitudinale de véhicule[2001/05]
Examination procedure12.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/18]
04.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9711864  (MONT BLANC IND AB [SE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9624509  (THULE IND AB [SE], et al);
 [A]WO9922963  (SPORT CARRIERS INC [US]);
 [A]EP0606852  (FAPA SPA [IT]);
 [A]DE8404525U  (ORIS);
 [A]DE8229446U  (ORIS)