Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020115

EP1020115 - Disinfecting agent and antiseptic based on alcohols [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bode Chemie GmbH & Co.
Melanchthonstrasse 27
22525 Hamburg / DE
[2003/24]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
Bode Chemie GmbH & Co.
Melanchthonstrasse 27
D-22525 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bloss, Richard, Dr.
Hermann-Löns-Weg 15
25462 Rellingen / DE
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Dinné, Erlend
Beiersdorf AG
Unnastrasse 48
20245 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Dinné, Erlend
Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48
20245 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date00100213.814.01.2000
[2000/29]
Priority number, dateDE199910152616.01.1999         Original published format: DE 19901526
DE1999200687U16.01.1999         Original published format: DE 29900687 U
[2000/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1020115
Date:19.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1020115
Date:11.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01N31/02, // (A01N31/02, 35:02, 31:02)
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:Desinfektionsmittel und Antiseptikum auf der Basis von Alkoholen[2000/29]
English:Disinfecting agent and antiseptic based on alcohols[2000/29]
French:Agent désinfectant et antiseptique à base d'alcools[2000/29]
Examination procedure23.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/03]
21.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.03.2003Fee for grant paid
12.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI11.06.2003
IE11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
DK11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
LU14.01.2004
BE31.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
[2005/23]
Former [2005/14]FI11.06.2003
IE11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
DK11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
BE31.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
Former [2005/02]FI11.06.2003
IE11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
DK11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
MC31.01.2004
Former [2004/29]FI11.06.2003
IE11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
DK11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
Former [2004/15]FI11.06.2003
IE11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
PT11.09.2003
Former [2004/05]FI11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
PT11.09.2003
Former [2004/02]NL11.06.2003
PT11.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9735475  (ANTISEPTICA CHEMISCH PHARMAZEU [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 1 - page 3; examples 6,7; claim - *;
 [A]DE4241079  (BODE CHEMIE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-4 * page 2, line 3 - line 40; example 1; claim - *;
 [A]EP0692192  (MFH MARIENFELDE GMBH UNTERNEHM [DE]) [A] 1-4 * page 2 - page 3, line 47 *;
 [A]  WEWALKA, GUENTHER ET AL, "Comparison of the efficacy of 14 procedures for the hygienic disinfection of hands", ZENTRALBL. BAKTERIOL., PARASITENKD., INFEKTIONSKR. HYG., ABT. 1: ORIG., REIHE B (1977), 165(2), 242-9, (1977), XP000909208 [A] 1-4 * Seite 242, die Zusammenfassung, Seiten 247-248, Abschnitt 4, "Diskussion" *
 [A]  S S BLOCK, Disinfection, Sterilization and Preservation, 4th Edition, PHILADELPHIA, US, LEA & FEBIGER, XP002137290 [A] 1-5 * the whole document *