Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020767

EP1020767 - Chemical amplification type positive resist composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.10.2007
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited
27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8260 / JP
[2006/49]
Former [2005/01]For all designated states
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited
27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8260 / JP
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome
Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Uetani, Yasunori
2-10-2-231, Sonehigashi-machi
Toyonaka-shi, Osaka / JP
02 / Inoue, Hiroki
2-10-3-312, Sonehigashi-machi
Toyonaka-shi, Osaka / JP
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/29]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00100239.318.01.2000
[2000/29]
Priority number, dateJP1999000909618.01.1999         Original published format: JP 909699
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1020767
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1020767
Date:06.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/039, G03F7/004
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/14]
Former [2000/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Chemisch verstärkte, positiv arbeitende Resistzusammensetzung[2000/29]
English:Chemical amplification type positive resist composition[2000/29]
French:Composition pour réserve de type positif chimiquement amplifiée[2000/29]
Examination procedure05.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/10]
31.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.2006Fee for grant paid
20.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR06.12.2006
IT06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
[2008/52]
Former [2008/23]IT06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
FR27.07.2007
Former [2007/35]IT06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
Former [2007/28]NL06.12.2006
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0982628  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [E] 1-7,10 * page 17; examples 9-11 *;
 [AD]EP0856773  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [AD] 1-10 * page 9 - page 12 *;
 [AD]DE19626003  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-10 * page 15, line 5 - line 15 * * page 68 - page 69; examples 66,67 *;
 [A]  UETANI Y. ET AL., "Standard developer available ArF resist and performance", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, USA, (199802), vol. 3333, no. 1, pages 546 - 553, XP002136158 [A] 1-10 * page 548; figure 2 * * page 549, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.312445
 [A]  DAMMEL R.R. ET AL., "Lithographic performance of a dry-etch stable methacrylate resist at 193 nm", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, USA, (199802), vol. 3333, no. 1, pages 144 - 151, XP002136159 [A] 1-10 * page 145; figure 3 * * page 146; figure 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.312393