Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018735

EP1018735 - Optical disk cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.03.2007
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.04.2007  [2007/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho Ota-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho
Ota-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamashita, Tatsumaro
4-3-39 Nishifunahazama, Shibata-cho
Shibata-gun, Miyagi-ken / JP
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date00100371.407.01.2000
[2000/28]
Priority number, dateJP1999000268608.01.1999         Original published format: JP 268699
JP1999012067527.04.1999         Original published format: JP 12067599
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1018735
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1018735
Date:09.08.2000
[2000/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:G11B23/03
[2000/28]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2001/17]
Former [2000/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optische Plattenkassette[2000/28]
English:Optical disk cartridge[2000/28]
French:Cassette à disque optique[2000/28]
Examination procedure14.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
10.02.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
05.06.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
15.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/14]
02.11.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
28.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.03.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.03.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
13.03.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
13.03.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.03.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
13.03.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
13.03.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.03.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.03.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
13.03.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
13.03.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.03.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.03.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.03.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0838819  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11 * column 4, line 53 - column 11, line 19; figure - *;
 [X]GB2272990  (HITACHI MAXELL [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,6 * page 7, line 23 - page 12, line 7; figure - *;
 [PX]EP0962933  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-5,10,11 * column A; figure -; claims 1-6 *;
 [PX]EP0961272  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-5,10,11 * column A; figure -; claims 1,11-15 *;
 [PX]EP0921526  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [PX] 1,3,4,10 * page 8, line 25 - page 9, line 15; figure - *;
 [PA]EP0959471  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [PA] 1,3,4,10 * column 14, line 8 - column 17, line 37; figure - *;
 [PA]EP0902428  (TDK CORP [JP]) [PA] 1 * column 6, line 35 - column 10, line 56; figure - *;
 [A]EP0335461  (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *