EP1031344 - Method of preparing silicone oil-in-water microemulsions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation P.O. Box 994 Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION P.O. Box 994 Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Halloran, Daniel Joseph 4705 Blossom Circle Midland, Michigan 48640 / US | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Spott, Gottfried, et al Spott & Weinmiller Patentanwälte Fasanenstrasse 159 82008 Unterhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | Spott, Gottfried, Dr., et al Spott & Weinmiller Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00100449.8 | 10.01.2000 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | US19990227838 | 11.01.1999 Original published format: US 227838 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1031344 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1031344 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | [2002/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K7/00, C08G77/06 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
A61K8/585 (EP,US);
A61K8/062 (EP,US);
A61K8/068 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
C09K23/54 (EP,US);
A61K2800/262 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/35] | A61K7/48, A61K7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Silikonöl-in-Wasser Mikroemulsionen | [2000/35] | English: | Method of preparing silicone oil-in-water microemulsions | [2000/35] | French: | Procédé de préparation de microémulsions huile de silicone-dans-l'eau | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 01.06.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2624867 (DOW CORNING LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-4* page 3, line 1 *; | [Y]EP0404027 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * page 2, lines 1-5 * * page 4, lines 25-27 *; | [Y]EP0579455 (DOW CORNING [US]) [Y] 1-4 * page 5, lines 54-57 *; | [X]EP0755959 (DOW CORNING [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 2 * * page 5, lines 39-41 * * page 6, columns 42-54 * * page 7, lines 30,31 * * examples 1-8 * |